House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3370
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1778
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1778
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1778
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1778
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|