Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1555 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1555
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 19, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 1, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1555 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for state educator certification
 examinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 21.048, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall propose rules prescribing comprehensive
 examinations for each class of certificate issued by the board.  The
 board shall determine the satisfactory level of performance
 required for each certification examination.  For the issuance of a
 generalist certificate, the board shall require a satisfactory
 level of examination performance in each core subject covered by
 the examination.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2014, the State Board
 for Educator Certification shall determine performance levels for
 certification examinations as provided by Subsection (a), Section
 21.048, Education Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *