House
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3088
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2721
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1539
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Open Government
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|