E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3835
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2808
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1081
|
Journal Page: 4198
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4198
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4198
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4043
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4043
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4043
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|