E | 04/24/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 04/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1258 | |
E | 04/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1580 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 849 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#200 | Journal Page: 1519 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1519 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1519 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1506 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1506 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 929 | Journal Page: 1506 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1544 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 337 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 01/02/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/02/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |