House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 117
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 117
|
Senate
|
01/02/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/02/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|