Senate | 04/30/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1330 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |