E | 05/24/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3396 | |
E | 05/13/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3190 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1696 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2764 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2764 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2764 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2745 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2745 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1634 | Journal Page: 2745 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2843 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1313 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |