E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3831
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1346
|
Journal Page: 5238
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5237
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5237
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5387
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3760
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3278
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3278
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3278
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3278
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3277
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#990
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Springer
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/20/13 4:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Lozano
|
Journal Page: 3656
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3656
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1851
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 539
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 539
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|