House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1313 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |