House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2832
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3925
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1003
|
Journal Page: 3924
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3924
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 3924
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3924
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Coleman and Harless
|
Journal Page: 3828
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3828
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/20/13 4:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3791
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3791
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1827
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|