E | 05/25/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
E | 05/14/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1810 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3240 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1732 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#761 | Journal Page: 3041 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3036 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3036 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1303 | Journal Page: 3036 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3090 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 920 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 529 |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |