1 | 1 | | By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1602 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 20, 2013, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization; |
---|
4 | 4 | | March 27, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 27, 2013, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1602 By: Garcia |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to reports and other information required of or held by |
---|
13 | 13 | | institutions of higher education. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 51.406, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
16 | 16 | | adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (d) Subsection (c) does not apply to a report required of a |
---|
18 | 18 | | university system or institution of higher education under any of |
---|
19 | 19 | | the following laws: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) Section 62.098, Education Code; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) Chapter 1551, Insurance Code; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (3) Section 51.0051, Education Code; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (4) Subchapter C, Chapter 606, Government Code; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (5) Subchapter E, Chapter 815, Government Code; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (6) Section 411.187(b), Government Code; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (7) Article 59.06(g)(1), Code of Criminal Procedure. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (e) This section does not apply to requests for information |
---|
28 | 28 | | from the State Auditor's Office. |
---|
29 | 29 | | SECTION 2. Subsection (g), Section 772.009, Government |
---|
30 | 30 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (g) Each state agency other than an [or] institution of |
---|
32 | 32 | | higher education shall file an annual report with the grant writing |
---|
33 | 33 | | team concerning the agency's efforts in acquiring available |
---|
34 | 34 | | discretionary federal funds during the preceding state fiscal year. |
---|
35 | 35 | | The grant writing team shall establish guidelines for information |
---|
36 | 36 | | included in the annual report required by this section. The grant |
---|
37 | 37 | | writing team shall evaluate the effectiveness of each agency in |
---|
38 | 38 | | acquiring discretionary federal funds and shall report the |
---|
39 | 39 | | evaluation to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 3. Section 2054.121, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
41 | 41 | | adding Subsection (f) to read as follows: |
---|
42 | 42 | | (f) The department and council shall review all plans and |
---|
43 | 43 | | reports required of an institution of higher education under this |
---|
44 | 44 | | section, including plans or reports required under this chapter. |
---|
45 | 45 | | After September 1, 2014, a plan or report required of state agencies |
---|
46 | 46 | | generally is not required of an institution of higher education |
---|
47 | 47 | | except to the extent expressly provided by department rule adopted |
---|
48 | 48 | | on or after September 1, 2013. |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 4. Subchapter Q, Chapter 361, Health and Safety |
---|
50 | 50 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 361.5061 to read as follows: |
---|
51 | 51 | | Sec. 361.5061. INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION. An |
---|
52 | 52 | | institution of higher education required to develop a source |
---|
53 | 53 | | reduction and waste minimization plan for more than one facility |
---|
54 | 54 | | under this subchapter may develop and submit a single plan covering |
---|
55 | 55 | | all facilities and submit a single annual report and executive |
---|
56 | 56 | | summary. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 5. Section 161.032, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
58 | 58 | | amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (g) Notwithstanding other requirements of this section, the |
---|
60 | 60 | | records of a medical committee of a university medical school or a |
---|
61 | 61 | | health sciences center, including a joint committee, may be |
---|
62 | 62 | | disclosed to the extent required by federal law as a condition of |
---|
63 | 63 | | federal funding. |
---|
64 | 64 | | SECTION 6. Subchapter L, Chapter 51, Education Code, is |
---|
65 | 65 | | repealed. |
---|
66 | 66 | | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
67 | 67 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
68 | 68 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
69 | 69 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
70 | 70 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
71 | 71 | | * * * * * |
---|