E | 05/16/2013 | Effective on 1/1/14 | ||
E | 05/16/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2036 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1873 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1822 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | RV#820 | Journal Page: 3216 |
House | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 818 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 818 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 818 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 818 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 818 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Huffman | Journal Page: 816 |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 815 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 815 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 883 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 554 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 554 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 516 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |