House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 554 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 554 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |