E
|
05/27/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3849
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4873
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1011
|
Journal Page: 3932
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3932
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3932
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3848
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
1-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3847
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3847
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1408
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 620
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|