Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1638 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Deuell S.B. No. 1638
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 20, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 April 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information included in the report of the Texas
 Economic Development Bank regarding the enterprise zone program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2303.052, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2303.052.  BANK REPORT REGARDING PROGRAM.  The bank
 must include the following information regarding the enterprise
 zone program in the report required by Section 489.107:
 (1)  an evaluation of the effectiveness of the program;
 (2)  a description of the use of state and local
 incentives under this chapter and their effect on revenue;
 (3)  an analysis of the performance of each individual
 enterprise project, compiled from information obtained under
 Sections 2303.205 and 2303.504(c); and
 (4) [(3)]  suggestions for legislation with regard to
 the program.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *