Senate | 04/23/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 556 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 556 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 485 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |