E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5383
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3494
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3494
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1064
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
1-S. King
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4017
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4016
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
2-J. Sheffield
|
Journal Page: 4016
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4016
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2999
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1170
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|