House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2999
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1248
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1248
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|