Senate | 05/14/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1118 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 557 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 557 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |