E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/09/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Technology
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 337
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/23/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 84
|
Senate
|
01/09/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|