E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/20/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2069 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2258 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1946 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#910 | Journal Page: 3557 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3557 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3557 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3546 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3425 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3425 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |