E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 48
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3516
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3516
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3516
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2707
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#957
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
3-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3615
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Davis
|
Journal Page: 1251
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1250
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1250
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1118
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 973
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|