Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1690 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1690
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 25, 2013, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
44 Relations; April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
55 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0;
66 April 29, 2013, sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1690 By: Garcia
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the establishment of a down payment assistance program
1313 by the manufactured housing division of the Texas Department of
1414 Housing and Community Affairs for the purchase of manufactured
1515 homes by low-income individuals and families.
1616 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1717 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 1201, Occupations Code, is
1818 amended by adding Section 1201.063 to read as follows:
1919 Sec. 1201.063. DOWN PAYMENT ASSISTANCE PROGRAM. (a) The
2020 department shall establish a program providing down payment
2121 assistance to eligible persons for the purchase of manufactured
2222 homes:
2323 (1) from a retailer licensed under this chapter; or
2424 (2) that have been converted to and are being sold as
2525 real property.
2626 (b) To be eligible for financial assistance under this
2727 section, a person must:
2828 (1) be an individual or family earning not more than 80
2929 percent of the area median income or applicable federal poverty
3030 line as determined under Section 2306.123 or 2306.1231, Government
3131 Code; and
3232 (2) except as provided by board rule, continuously
3333 occupy the purchased manufactured home as the person's primary
3434 residence for at least the two-year period following the date of
3535 purchase of the home.
3636 (c) For each manufactured home purchased with financial
3737 assistance under this section, the assistance may not exceed the
3838 lesser of:
3939 (1) $2,000;
4040 (2) 50 percent of any down payment required by the
4141 primary lender; or
4242 (3) five percent of the total purchase price of the
4343 manufactured home and the real property on which a manufactured
4444 home has been installed, if a real property election has been
4545 perfected under Section 1201.222(a).
4646 (d) Financial assistance provided under this section must
4747 be provided in connection with a primary loan that:
4848 (1) is from a lender licensed to make consumer loans in
4949 this state or a federally insured depository institution if the
5050 loan does not involve the use of real property as security; or
5151 (2) complies with the applicable requirements of state
5252 and federal law if the loan involves the use of real property as
5353 security.
5454 (e) The board shall adopt rules governing:
5555 (1) the administration of the program;
5656 (2) the issuance of financial assistance under the
5757 program;
5858 (3) creditworthiness, purchase price, and other
5959 eligibility standards;
6060 (4) exceptions to the residency requirement under
6161 Subsection (b)(2), including death, loss of employment, or other
6262 exigent circumstances;
6363 (5) contractual enforcement of the residency
6464 requirement under Subsection (b)(2); and
6565 (6) the structure of the financial assistance provided
6666 under this section, which may include secured or unsecured deferred
6767 forgivable loans.
6868 (f) The department may fund the program with:
6969 (1) money appropriated to the department for that
7070 purpose; and
7171 (2) money from the housing trust fund established
7272 under Section 2306.201, Government Code, that is made available to
7373 the department for that purpose.
7474 (g) The department may reserve for payment of
7575 administrative expenses not more than five percent of money
7676 received for the program under this section.
7777 SECTION 2. The Texas Department of Housing and Community
7878 Affairs shall adopt the rules required by Subsection (e), Section
7979 1201.063, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than
8080 December 1, 2013.
8181 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
8282 * * * * *