House | 05/17/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3674 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3348 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1697 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 595 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 595 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |