House
|
05/21/2013
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4044
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 4044
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4044
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/21/13 4:25 PM
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
10-Rose
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1048
|
Journal Page: 4005
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 6, Section 7(a)(2)
|
Journal Page: 3999
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3999
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1408
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1355
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1355
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1355
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|