E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3056
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3056
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3056
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3056
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3770
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#972
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Cook
|
Journal Page: 3767
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3767
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Cook and Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
1-K. King
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nichols
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 910
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|