E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1042
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2918
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2918
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#397
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Amended
|
4-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3391
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|