Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1750 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 1750
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 25, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Rural Affairs,
 and Homeland Security; April 25, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays
 0; April 25, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1750 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a criminal penalty for failure to handle certain
 animals in accordance with rules of the Texas Animal Health
 Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 161.041, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A person commits an offense if the person knowingly
 fails to handle, in accordance with rules adopted by the
 commission, livestock, exotic livestock, domestic fowl, or exotic
 fowl:
 (1)  infected with a disease listed in Subsection (a);
 (2)  exposed, as defined by commission rule, to a
 disease listed in Subsection (a) if the commission has notified the
 person that the animal was exposed to the disease; or
 (3)  subject to a testing requirement due to a risk of
 exposure, as defined by commission rule, to a specific disease if
 the commission has notified the person of the testing requirement.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *