E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1174
|
Journal Page: 4502
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4502
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3417
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3417
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1860
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1860
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1860
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1860
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#669
|
Journal Page: 2768
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2768
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2768
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2605
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Open Government
|
|
Journal Page: 119
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 119
|
Senate
|
01/15/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|