Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB176 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 176


 AN ACT
 relating to the distribution of certain consultants' reports.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2254, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2254.041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2254.041.  DISTRIBUTION OF CONSULTANT REPORTS. (a)  A
 consulting services contract must include provisions that allow the
 state agency contracting with the consultant and any other state
 agency and the legislature, at the contracting state agency's
 discretion, to distribute the consultant report, if any, and to
 post the report on the agency's Internet website or the website of a
 standing committee of the legislature.
 (b)  This section does not affect the application of Chapter
 552 to a consultant's report.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, Section 2254.041, Government Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a consulting services contract entered into on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A consulting services
 contract entered into before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the contract is entered
 into, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Section 2254.041, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 does not apply to a consulting services contract entered into on or
 after the effective date of this Act if:
 (1)  the state agency entered into negotiations for the
 consulting services contract before the effective date of this Act;
 and
 (2)  the contract is executed before December 31, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 176 passed the Senate on
 March 13, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 16, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 24, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 176 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 8, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 16, 2013, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 23, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor