House | 05/21/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3090 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2200 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 601 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 601 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |