E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5435 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3861 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4873 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3185 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 3185 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 3185 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3183 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2405 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Record vote | RV#1004 | Journal Page: 3925 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3925 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3925 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3830 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Capriglione | Journal Page: 3829 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3829 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3371 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 601 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 601 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |