By: Huffman S.B. No. 1773 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 25, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; April 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 4, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1773 By: Huffman A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of a select interim committee to review and make recommendations for substantive changes to ethics laws. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. INTERIM STUDY REGARDING ETHICS LAWS. (a) A select interim committee is created to study and review the statutes and regulations related to ethics, including campaign finance laws, lobby laws, and personal financial disclosure laws. (b) The study must consider: (1) the purposes of the current laws and whether the laws accomplish those purposes; (2) the effectiveness of the current laws; and (3) what changes, if any, should be made to more effectively accomplish the purposes of the laws. (c) The committee is composed of: (1) four members appointed by the lieutenant governor as follows: (A) three senators; and (B) one member of the public; (2) four members appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives as follows: (A) three state representatives; and (B) one member of the public; and (3) the presiding officer of the Texas Ethics Commission on the effective date of this Act. (d) The members of the committee shall elect a presiding officer from among its members. (e) The committee shall convene at the call of the presiding officer. (f) The committee has all other powers and duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and the house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on administration. (g) Not later than December 20, 2014, the committee shall report the committee's findings and recommendations to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the governor. The committee shall include in its recommendations specific statutory and rule changes that appear necessary from the results of the committee's study under Subsection (a) of this section. (h) Not later than the 60th day after the effective date of this Act, the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of representatives shall appoint the members of the committee created under this section. (i) The Texas Legislative Council and the Texas Ethics Commission shall provide any necessary staff and resources to the committee created under this section. SECTION 2. ABOLITION OF COMMITTEE. The committee is abolished and this Act expires December 21, 2014. SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *