E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5435 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3861 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4874 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3215 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 3215 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 3215 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3214 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2809 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4172 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1059 | Journal Page: 4172 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4172 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4172 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4007 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Record vote | RV#1049 | Journal Page: 4007 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 4007 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Amended | 1-Morrison | Journal Page: 4006 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4006 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1172 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 1099 |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1116 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 975 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |