Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1795 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1795


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of navigators for health benefit
 exchanges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 13, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 4154 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 4154.  NAVIGATORS FOR HEALTH BENEFIT EXCHANGES
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 4154.001.  PURPOSE. Since the State of Texas opted out
 of implementing a state exchange, pursuant to the Patient
 Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) as amended
 by the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 (Pub. L.
 No. 111-152), the purpose of this chapter is to provide a state
 solution to ensure that Texans are able to find and apply for
 affordable health coverage under any federally run health benefit
 exchange, while helping consumers in this state.
 Sec. 4154.002.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Health benefit exchange" means a health benefit
 exchange established or operated by the secretary of the United
 States Department of Health and Human Services under 42 U.S.C.
 Section 18041.
 (2)  "Health benefit plan issuer" means an insurance
 company or health maintenance organization regulated by the
 department and authorized to issue a health insurance policy or
 other health benefit plan. The term includes:
 (A)  a stock life, health, or accident insurance
 company;
 (B)  a mutual life, health, or accident insurance
 company;
 (C)  a stock casualty insurance company;
 (D)  a mutual casualty insurance company;
 (E)  a Lloyd's plan;
 (F)  a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange;
 (G)  a fraternal benefit society;
 (H)  a stipulated premium company;
 (I)  a nonprofit hospital, medical, or dental
 service corporation, including a company subject to Chapter 842;
 and
 (J)  a health maintenance organization.
 (3)  "Navigator" means an individual or entity
 performing the activities and duties of a navigator as described by
 42 U.S.C. Section 18031 or any regulation enacted under that
 section.
 Sec. 4154.003.  APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW.  Notwithstanding
 Section 101.051, 101.102, 4001.051, or 4001.101 or any other law, a
 navigator that satisfies the requirements of this chapter may
 perform any duty or function authorized or required by this chapter
 or any applicable federal law or regulation without obtaining a
 license from the department or any other agency of this state.
 Sec. 4154.004.  EXEMPTIONS. This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  a licensed life, accident, and health insurance
 agent;
 (2)  a licensed life and health insurance counselor; or
 (3)  a licensed life and health insurance company.
 Sec. 4154.005.  RULES. The commissioner shall adopt rules
 necessary to implement this chapter and to meet the minimum
 requirements of 42 U.S.C. Section 18031, including regulations.
 Sec. 4154.006.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER.  This chapter expires
 September 1, 2017.
 SUBCHAPTER B.  STANDARDS AND QUALIFICATIONS FOR NAVIGATORS
 Sec. 4154.051.  SUFFICIENCY OF FEDERAL QUALIFICATIONS.
 (a)  The commissioner shall determine whether the standards and
 qualifications for navigators provided by 42 U.S.C. Section 18031
 and any regulations enacted under that section are sufficient to
 ensure that navigators can perform the required duties, including:
 (1)  assisting consumers in completing the uniform
 application for health coverage affordability programs available
 through a health benefit exchange;
 (2)  explaining how health coverage affordability
 programs work and interact, including Medicaid, the children's
 health insurance program, and advance premium tax credits and
 cost-sharing assistance;
 (3)  explaining health insurance concepts related to
 qualified health plans, including premiums, cost-sharing,
 networks, and essential health benefits;
 (4)  providing culturally and linguistically
 appropriate information;
 (5)  avoiding conflicts of interest; and
 (6)  establishing standards and processes relating to
 privacy and data security.
 (b)  If the commissioner determines that the standards
 provided by regulations enacted under 42 U.S.C. Section 18031 are
 insufficient to ensure that navigators can perform the required
 duties, the commissioner shall make a good faith effort to work in
 cooperation with the United States Department of Health and Human
 Services and to propose improvements to those standards. If after a
 reasonable interval the commissioner determines that the standards
 remain insufficient, the commissioner by rule shall establish
 standards and qualifications to ensure that navigators in this
 state can perform the required duties.
 (c)  At a minimum, rules adopted under this section must
 provide that a navigator in this state has not:
 (1)  had a professional license suspended or revoked;
 (2)  been the subject of any other disciplinary action
 by a financial or insurance regulator of this state, another state,
 or the United States; or
 (3)  been convicted of a felony.
 (d)  The commissioner shall at regular intervals obtain from
 the health benefit exchange a list of all navigators providing
 assistance in this state and, with respect to an individual, the
 name of the individual's employer or organization.
 (e)  The commissioner may by rule establish a state
 registration for navigators sufficient to allow the department to
 ensure that navigators satisfy the standards provided by Subsection
 (c) and collect the information described by Subsection (d).
 Sec. 4154.052.  LIMITS ON ADVERTISING. A navigator may not,
 in any advertisement or other materials that are published or
 distributed in any manner by or on behalf of the navigator:
 (1)  indicate or suggest the professional superiority
 of the navigator;
 (2)  indicate or suggest the performance of
 professional service by the navigator in a superior manner; or
 (3)  include one or more of the following phrases in the
 navigator's name or materials:
 (A)  "insurance advisor" or "insurance advisory";
 (B)  "insurance agent" or "insurance agency"; or
 (C)  "insurance consultant" or "insurance
 counselor."
 Sec. 4154.053.  CERTAIN COMPENSATION PROHIBITED. A
 navigator may not receive compensation for services or duties as a
 navigator that are prohibited by federal law, including
 compensation from a health benefit plan issuer.
 Sec. 4154.054.  ADDITIONAL TRAINING REQUIREMENTS.  The
 commissioner shall adopt rules authorizing additional training for
 navigators as the commissioner considers necessary to ensure
 compliance with changes in state or federal law.
 SUBCHAPTER C.  PROHIBITED ACTS
 Sec. 4154.101.  NAVIGATORS NOT LICENSED AS AGENTS.
 (a)  Unless the navigator is licensed to act as an agent under
 Chapter 4054, a navigator may not:
 (1)  sell, solicit, or negotiate coverage under a
 health benefit plan;
 (2)  endorse a health benefit plan or group of health
 benefit plans;
 (3)  provide, or offer to provide, information or
 services related to insurance products not offered through a health
 benefit exchange;
 (4)  offer advice or advise consumers on which
 qualified health plan available through a health benefit exchange
 is preferable;
 (5)  accept any compensation that is wholly or partly
 dependent on whether a person enrolls in or purchases a health
 benefit plan; or
 (6)  in the course of acting as a navigator, engage in
 any electioneering activities or finance or otherwise support the
 candidacy of a person for an office in the legislative, executive,
 or judicial branch of state government, or of the government of the
 United States, or any political subdivision of this state.
 (b)  This section does not prohibit a navigator from
 providing information on public benefits and health coverage, or
 other information and services consistent with the mission of a
 navigator.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1795 passed the Senate on
 April 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1795 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 120,
 Nays 26, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor