E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | January 1, 2015 | |
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3778 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3737 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2922 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 4168 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4168 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4168 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4132 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4132 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1830 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Eltife | Journal Page: 1179 |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |