Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1808 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1808
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 29, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 3; April 29, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1808By: By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the cost effects of expanding eligibility for medical
 assistance under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care
 Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.02473 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.02473.  COST EFFECTS OF EXPANDED ELIGIBILITY FOR
 MEDICAL ASSISTANCE UNDER PATIENT PROTECTION AND AFFORDABLE CARE
 ACT. (a)  In this section, "commission" means the Health and Human
 Services Commission.
 (b)  If the commission expands eligibility for medical
 assistance in accordance with and provides medical assistance using
 federal matching funds made available under the Patient Protection
 and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148), as amended by the
 Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 (Pub. L. No.
 111-152), the commission, in cooperation with the comptroller and
 Legislative Budget Board, shall conduct a study regarding the cost
 effects of that expanded eligibility.  The study must identify:
 (1)  the estimated amount of uncompensated care costs
 the state will save each state fiscal year by expanding that
 eligibility;
 (2)  the estimated amount of health care costs hospital
 districts and counties in this state will save each state fiscal
 year by expanding that eligibility; and
 (3)  the estimated reduction in uncompensated care
 costs to hospital districts and counties that will result from the
 expansion of medical assistance eligibility and that would
 otherwise be paid from hospital district and county tax revenue.
 (c)  The commission shall ensure that cost savings
 identified under Subsection (b)(1) are reflected in each biennial
 legislative appropriations request submitted to the Legislative
 Budget Board by the commission or a health and human services
 agency.
 (d)  In preparing a general appropriations bill as required
 by Section 322.008, Government Code, the Legislative Budget Board
 shall ensure that any proposed appropriation for providing health
 care to residents of this state reflects the cost savings
 identified under Subsection (b)(1) and the legislative
 appropriations requests prepared in accordance with Subsection
 (c).
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 26, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Section 26.0442 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.0442.  TAX RATE ADJUSTMENT FOR EXPANDED ELIGIBILITY
 FOR MEDICAL ASSISTANCE UNDER PATIENT PROTECTION AND AFFORDABLE CARE
 ACT. In the first tax year in which a hospital district or a county
 adopts a tax rate and in which the state expands eligibility for
 medical assistance in accordance with and provides medical
 assistance using federal matching funds made available under the
 Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148),
 as amended by the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of
 2010 (Pub. L. No. 111-152), the effective tax rate and the rollback
 tax rate for the hospital district or the county are decreased by
 the rate that, if applied to current total value, would impose an
 amount of taxes equal to the reduction in uncompensated care costs
 realized by the hospital district or county as identified under
 Section 32.02473(b)(3), Human Resources Code, that will result from
 the provision of that assistance.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than the first anniversary of the
 effective date of expanded eligibility criteria implemented in
 accordance with the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
 (Pub. L. No. 111-148), as amended by the Health Care and Education
 Reconciliation Act of 2010 (Pub. L. No. 111-152), for the Medicaid
 program, the Health and Human Services Commission, in cooperation
 with the comptroller of public accounts and the Legislative Budget
 Board, shall complete the study required under Subsection (b),
 Section 32.02473, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Subsections (c) and (d), Section 32.02473, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, apply only to legislative
 appropriations requests and general appropriations bills,
 respectively, prepared on or after the date the Health and Human
 Services Commission completes the study required under Subsection
 (b), Section 32.02473, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *