E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/08/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1525
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#391
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 519
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1073
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|