Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1856 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eltife S.B. No. 1856
 (In the Senate - Filed March 25, 2013; March 26, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 22, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1856 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of board members for emergency services
 districts in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (h), Section 775.034, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (h)  This section does not apply to a district located wholly
 in a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than three million; or
 (2)  with a population of more than 200,000 that
 borders Lake Palestine.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 775.0345, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0345.  ELECTION OF BOARD IN CERTAIN [POPULOUS]
 COUNTIES.
 SECTION 3.  Section 775.0345, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), (e), (f), and (g) and
 adding Subsections (b-1), (d-1), and (h-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a district located wholly
 in a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than three million; or
 (2)  with a population of more than 200,000 that
 borders Lake Palestine.
 (b)  The governing body of a district consists of a
 five-person board of emergency services commissioners elected as
 prescribed by this section.  Except as provided by Subsections (h)
 and (h-1) [Subsection (h)], emergency services commissioners serve
 four-year terms.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the governing body of
 a district described by Subsection (a)(2) is governed by a
 five-member board of emergency services commissioners elected from
 single-member districts. One director is elected from each
 single-member district. As soon as possible after the district is
 created, the commissioners court of the county in which the
 district is located shall divide the district into five numbered
 single-member districts.
 (d-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d), to be eligible to be a
 candidate for emergency services commissioner in a single-member
 district on an initial board in a district described by Subsection
 (a)(2), a person must be at least 18 years of age and a resident of
 that single-member district.
 (e)  A candidate for emergency services commissioner on an
 initial board must give the voter registrar of the county [clerk] a
 sworn notice of the candidate's intention to run for office. The
 notice must state the person's name, age, and address and state that
 the person is serving notice of intent to run for emergency services
 commissioner. If the person intends to run for emergency services
 commissioner in a single-member district in a district described by
 Subsection (a)(2), the notice must also specify the single-member
 district the person seeks to represent. On receipt of the notice,
 the voter registrar of the county [clerk] shall have the
 candidate's name placed on the ballot.
 (f)  The voter registrar of the county [clerk] shall appoint
 an election judge to certify the results of the election.
 (g)  After the election is held, the voter registrar or
 deputy registrar of the county [clerk or the clerk's deputy] shall
 prepare a sworn statement of the election costs incurred by the
 county.  The statement shall be given to the newly elected board,
 which shall order the appropriate official to reimburse the county
 for the county's election costs.
 (h-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (h), the five initial
 emergency services commissioners elected from single-member
 districts in a district described by Subsection (a)(2) shall draw
 lots to determine which two commissioners serve terms that expire
 on December 31 of the second year following the year in which the
 election was held and which three commissioners serve terms that
 expire on December 31 of the fourth year following the year in which
 the election was held.
 SECTION 4.  The heading to Section 775.0355, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0355.  DISQUALIFICATION OF EMERGENCY SERVICES
 COMMISSIONERS IN CERTAIN [POPULOUS] COUNTIES.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (b), Section 775.0355, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies only to a district located wholly
 in a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than three million; or
 (2)  with a population of more than 200,000 that
 borders Lake Palestine.
 SECTION 6.  The heading to Section 775.0445, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0445.  VACANCY ON BOARD OF DISTRICT LOCATED IN
 CERTAIN [POPULOUS] COUNTIES.
 SECTION 7.  Subsection (b), Section 775.0445, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies only to a district located wholly
 in a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than three million; or
 (2)  with a population of more than 200,000 that
 borders Lake Palestine.
 SECTION 8.  (a)  This Act does not prohibit a person who is
 an emergency services commissioner on the effective date of this
 Act and who was appointed under Section 775.034, Health and Safety
 Code, from running for election to the board if the person has the
 qualifications required for a member under Section 775.0345, Health
 and Safety Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  The terms of the members of a board of emergency
 services commissioners serving on the effective date of this Act
 who were appointed under Section 775.034, Health and Safety Code,
 before the effective date of this Act expire on the date a majority
 of the members of the initial board of emergency services
 commissioners elected under Subsection (c) of this section qualify
 to serve.
 (c)  The county judge of a county with an emergency services
 district to which Subdivision (2), Subsection (a), Section
 775.0345, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, applies on
 the effective date of this Act and to which Section 775.034, Health
 and Safety Code, previously applied shall establish an election to
 elect the initial emergency services commissioners of that district
 in the manner required by Subsections (c) through (h), Section
 775.0345, Health and Safety Code, for election of the initial
 commissioners as if the district had been created on the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *