E | 05/10/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2719 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1450 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Record vote | RV#546 | Journal Page: 2411 |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2411 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2411 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2357 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2357 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 832 | Journal Page: 2357 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 410 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 410 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 410 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 443 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 235 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 01/18/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |