E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4873
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1021
|
Journal Page: 3941
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3941
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Naishtat
|
Journal Page: 3941
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3941
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3854
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Kuempel
|
Journal Page: 3854
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3854
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3192
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1743
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1172
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 728
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|