Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1871 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1871


 AN ACT
 relating to the state cemetery.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2165.256, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) and amending Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the property other
 than the property described as Lot No. 5, Division B, City of
 Austin, Travis County, Texas, is no longer dedicated for cemetery
 purposes as part of the State Cemetery as provided by that
 subsection if, not later than December 31, 2014:
 (1)  the State Cemetery Committee:
 (A)  makes affirmative findings that:
 (i)  the property is no longer needed for
 cemetery purposes;
 (ii)  proceeds from a real property
 transaction involving the property described by this subsection
 will be used to further the goals of the State Cemetery Committee,
 including capital improvements or major repairs or renovations to
 the State Cemetery, or for a purpose described by Subsection (p);
 and
 (iii)  concerns expressed by residents of
 neighborhoods in the vicinity of the property have been considered
 and that efforts have been made to address those concerns; and
 (B)  expressly consents by a majority vote of the
 committee to remove the dedication; and
 (2)  the chair of the State Cemetery Committee files in
 the deed records of Travis County and submits for publication in the
 Texas Register a document indicating that the dedication is
 removed.
 (d)  Persons eligible for burial in the State Cemetery are:
 (1)  a former member of the legislature or a member who
 dies in office;
 (2)  a former elective state official or an elective
 state official who dies in office;
 (3)  a former state official or a state official who
 dies in office who has been appointed by the governor and confirmed
 by the senate and who served at least 10 [12] years in the office to
 which appointed;
 (4)  a person specified by a governor's proclamation,
 subject to review and approval by the committee under Subsection
 (e);
 (5)  a person specified by a concurrent resolution
 adopted by the legislature, subject to review and approval by the
 committee under Subsection (e); and
 (6)  a person specified by order of the committee under
 Subsection (e).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1871 passed the Senate on
 May 13, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 2; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 24, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1871 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor