House
|
05/20/2013
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3849
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3)
|
Journal Page: 3848
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3848
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1172
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 139
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 120
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 120
|
Senate
|
01/18/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|