E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5435 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3861 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3866 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2923 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4168 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 4168 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4168 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4168 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4133 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4133 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2842 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1615 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1615 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1615 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1615 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1614 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1614 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1614 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |