E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5026
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1317
|
Journal Page: 5025
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5025
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3757
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4883
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4883
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3254
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3254
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1702
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2859
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#697
|
Journal Page: 2858
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2858
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2858
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2822
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2822
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Kleinschmidt
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1077
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2779
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2158
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1114
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1114
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1113
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1113
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|