S.B. No. 1908 AN ACT relating to a study conducted by the Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System and the repeal of certain court fees and costs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 72.031 to read as follows: Sec. 72.031. STUDY TO REPEAL CERTAIN COURT FEES AND COSTS. (a) Not later than September 1, 2014, the office shall: (1) conduct a study on court fees and costs that identifies each statutory law imposing a court fee or cost in a court in this state; (2) determine whether each identified fee or cost is necessary to accomplish the stated statutory purpose; (3) compile a list of the identified fees and costs and of each fee or cost the office determines is necessary; (4) publish the list on the office's Internet website and in the Texas Register; and (5) provide a copy of the list and determinations to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives. (b) In conducting the study required under Subsection (a), the office shall consult with local government representatives as the office determines appropriate. (c) The Texas Legislative Council shall prepare for consideration by the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, a revision of the statutes of this state as necessary to reflect the court fees and costs identified by the office as not necessary in the study conducted under Subsection (a). (d) This section expires January 1, 2016. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1908 passed the Senate on May 6, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1908 passed the House, with amendment, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor