Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1909 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1909
22 (In the Senate - Filed April 24, 2013; April 25, 2013, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
44 Relations; May 10, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
55 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2013, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the period for confirmation of the Williamson County
1111 Municipal Utility District No. 21.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 8132.003, Special District Local Laws
1414 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1515 Sec. 8132.003. CONFIRMATION ELECTION REQUIRED. If the
1616 creation of the district is not confirmed at a confirmation
1717 election held under Section 8132.023 before September 1, 2017
1818 [2013]:
1919 (1) the district is dissolved September 1, 2017
2020 [2013], except that:
2121 (A) any debts incurred shall be paid;
2222 (B) any assets that remain after the payment of
2323 debts shall be transferred to Williamson County; and
2424 (C) the organization of the district shall be
2525 maintained until all debts are paid and remaining assets are
2626 transferred; and
2727 (2) this chapter expires September 1, 2020 [2016].
2828 SECTION 2. Section 8132.025, Special District Local Laws
2929 Code, is amended to read as follows:
3030 Sec. 8132.025. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
3131 expires September 1, 2020, unless the creation of the district is
3232 confirmed at a confirmation election held under Section 8132.023
3333 before September 1, 2017 [2016].
3434 SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
3535 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
3636 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
3737 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
3838 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
3939 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
4040 Government Code.
4141 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
4242 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
4343 Environmental Quality.
4444 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
4545 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
4646 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
4747 representatives within the required time.
4848 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
4949 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
5050 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
5151 and accomplished.
5252 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5353 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5454 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5555 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5656 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
5757 legislative session.
5858 * * * * *