E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective in 90 days -- 8/26/13
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/08/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#376
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Price
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 276
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 276
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|